Most of the time, when I'm bored during math class, I play with my calculator to satisfy my boredom. Recently, I've discovered that when multiplying any number by 11, 111, or any number similar to it, that it has a pattern (though I guess everything in math has a pattern). I don't know if this technique is original, because I didn't read anything about this. It's just mere observation. If it's a tried and true technique, let me know.

## Basic Multiplication

The basic form in multiplication is A x B = C.

Where A is the multiplicand, B is the multiplier, and C is the product.

## Multiplying Single Digit Multiplicands

We all know that when we multiply a number lower than 10 by 11, we just copy the multiplicand base (1-9) onto the number of 1's in the multiplier (11, 111, 1,111, and so on).

Examples:

- 2 x 11 = 22
- 4 x 111 = 444

## Multiplying Multiplicands with Two or More Digits by 11

When multiplying any multiplicand by 11, it is just as easy as multiplying with a single digit multiplicand.

## Step 1: Divide the Multiplicand into Two Parts

When I say divide the multiplicand into two parts, I don't mean mathematically divide it by 2 (which is A/2). I mean separate the two digits, which will be named A and B.

Let's use the problem **56 x 11 = ?** for our example in this article.

56 x 11 = ?

Separate the multiplicand into two parts.

5 | 6

Now 56 is separated into two parts—5 and 6.

A = 5 and B= 6

## Step 2: B Is the Last Digit of the Product

In the first step, we divided the multiplicand into two separate digits to get A and B. The last digit of the product (the ones place) will be B.

A =5 and B =6

6 will now be the last digit (ones) in the product.

**56 x 11 = __6**

## Step 3: Sum of A and B Is the Middle Digit

To get the middle portion of the product (the tens), find the sum of A and B, as in C. But only the last digit (the ones) in C is considered. The rest is carried over.

Find the sum of A and B.

A + B = ?

Since A is 5 and B is 6, we get the equation: A + B = C => 5 + 6 = ? => 5 + 6 = 11.

Since only the last digit (the ones) is considered in C for the final product...

**56 x 11 = _16**

The tens (1) is carried over.

## Step 4: First Digit(s) of the Product

To find the first digit/s of the product, add A with the carried over number from the previous step.

Now, the first digit (hundreds) of the final product is A, added to it the number carried over from the tens of the last step (1).

56 x 11 = (5+1)16

Which amounts to...

**56 x 11 = 616**

## Until Next Time

I wanted to write everything in just one article, but realize that it would be too long. Don't forget to subscribe and like if you learned something, and also don't hesitate to ask anything regarding the topic.

**Want to master Microsoft Excel and take your work-from-home job prospects to the next level?** Jump-start your career with our Premium A-to-Z Microsoft Excel Training Bundle from the new Gadget Hacks Shop and get lifetime access to more than 40 hours of Basic to Advanced instruction on functions, formula, tools, and more.

Other worthwhile deals to check out:

- 97% off The Ultimate 2021 White Hat Hacker Certification Bundle
- 98% off The 2021 Accounting Mastery Bootcamp Bundle
- 99% off The 2021 All-in-One Data Scientist Mega Bundle
- 59% off XSplit VCam: Lifetime Subscription (Windows)
- 98% off The 2021 Premium Learn To Code Certification Bundle
- 62% off MindMaster Mind Mapping Software: Perpetual License
- 41% off NetSpot Home Wi-Fi Analyzer: Lifetime Upgrades

## 8 Comments

Very cool trick. I tried it and it works. At least... on the few numbers I tested. Is there a situation where this wouldn't work?

Actually I haven't encountered anyhing that defies that law, (cough) ..trick. Thanks for reading and commenting. Next time I'll write an article that uses 111 or 1111,-or any similar numbers though it's almost the same as that.

Another cool fact is that any multiple of 9 will have digits that add up to 9 (or 18 or 27 etc which themselves add up to 9) so 9x8 is 72 (7+2 =9) or 9x8x13 = 936 (9+3+6=18). That does not give you the answer quickly but it does allow you to check your result quickly.

Nice, it's cool that mathematics have hidden tricks. Math can be hard but as long as we can find more things like this we can conquer math. Thanks for reading and giving info in your comments.

Can you try making a guide to multiplying by 7 ? That would help me a lot .

Another cool 11 multiplier for digits between 10 and 19: add up the two digits, and the answer is the number you're multiplying by 11, but with the sum of the two digits in between them. So like for 14, 1 + 4 = 5, so 11 x 14 = 154.

appreciate your thought and please tell me how can can add any number within six second without using calculator.

for example.568979+32568 and etc...

Im going to have some pie and hot dogs and pizza and....BRAGHHH...

## Share Your Thoughts