When you need to crunch numbers quickly — and I mean *really* quickly — there's a cool method you can use to multiply two numbers together in just a few seconds.

This is great when you need to speed through multiplication homework, and is also good for impressing your math teacher or peers, or as just a cool party trick (depending on your crowd). Mental math for the win! Now, this trick will only apply in a few multiplication settings, but more on that later.

For the first example, let's calculate the following:

## 24 x 26 =

Start by taking the first digit of the first number (2 for 24) and multiplying that by the number directly higher than it, which will give you the first digit(s) of the answer. So for 24 multiplied by 26, it would be 2 (first digit in first number) multiplied by 3 (one digit higher) = 6.

This means that **6** is our first digit in the answer.

Now take the second digit of the first number (4 for 24) and multiple that by the second digit of the second number (6 for 26), which will give you the remaining digits of the answer. So for 24 multiplied by 26, it would be 4 (second digit in first number) x 6 (second digit in second number) = 24.

**2** and **4** are the the last digits of the answer.

So, 24 x 26 = **624**.

Voilà! You're done. That's some next level Harry Potter-style magic, right?

## A Few Restrictions

If you thought this method was too good to be true, well, you're right. There are a few restrictions, or caveats, that must be adhered to:

- the first digits of both numbers must be the same
- the last digit of both numbers must equal 10

If you look at the example above, the first digit in each number (24, 26) is **2**, and the last digits in each (4, 6) equals **10**. Let's do a few more examples to hit this point home.

## 37 x 33 =

For 37 multiplied by 33, it would be 3 (first digit in first number) multiplied by 4 (one digit higher) = 12.

That means that **1** and **2** are our first digits in the answer.

For the second part of the trick, it would be 7 (second digit in first number) multiplied by 3 (second digit in second number) = 21.

That means that **2** and **1** are the the last digits of the answer.

So, 37 x 33 = **1,221**.

## 122 x 128 =

For 122 multiplied by 128, it would be 12 (first digits in first number) multiplied by 13 (one digit higher) = 156.

So **1**, **5**, and **6** are our first digits in the answer.

For the second part of the trick, it would be 2 (second digit in first number) multiplied by 8 (second digit in second number) = 16.

**1** and **6** are the the last digits of the answer.

So, 122 x 128 = **15,616**.

## 59 x 51 =

Okay, so the above examples were all pretty easy. Now let's try one where the ones digits (the second digits, the ones that are supposed to equal 10) are multiplied together but don't exceed 10. In this case, you would add a zero before the answer.

For 59 multiplied by 51, it would be 5 (first digits in first number) multiplied by 6 (one digit higher) = 30.

That means that **3** and **0** are our first digits in the answer.

For the second part of the trick, it would be 9 (second digit in first number) multiplied by 1 (second digit in second number) = 9. Since this is less than 10, we would add a zero beforehand.

That means that **0** and **9** are the the last digits of the answer.

So, 59 x 51 = **3,009**.

For a more visual guide, check out the video below from Roger73026 on YouTube, which has more examples of this math trick in action:

**Want to master Microsoft Excel and take your work-from-home job prospects to the next level?** Jump-start your career with our Premium A-to-Z Microsoft Excel Training Bundle from the new Gadget Hacks Shop and get lifetime access to more than 40 hours of Basic to Advanced instruction on functions, formula, tools, and more.

Other worthwhile deals to check out:

- 97% off The Ultimate 2021 White Hat Hacker Certification Bundle
- 98% off The 2021 Accounting Mastery Bootcamp Bundle
- 99% off The 2021 All-in-One Data Scientist Mega Bundle
- 59% off XSplit VCam: Lifetime Subscription (Windows)
- 98% off The 2021 Premium Learn To Code Certification Bundle
- 62% off MindMaster Mind Mapping Software: Perpetual License
- 41% off NetSpot Home Wi-Fi Analyzer: Lifetime Upgrades

## 33 Comments

NOWAY

try with : 10 X 10 ???

84 X 88 ???

the last digits have to equal 10

ok

wow

well to solve the theory's problem... you can do it as (15-5)(15-5)=(15X15)-(15X5)-(15X5)-(5)^2 and then use the relation in 15X15... that's a general solution to have last digits adding to 10 with calibrating them to 5, anyone has a much shorter faster solution?

yea watch the whole video it has 2 meet 2 criterea... the first digit on the first number has to be the same as the first digit on the second.. and the 2 second digits have to add to 10... whcih all in all kinda makes this treick useless

Very good!

ok!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!not too

good

well if ur smart enough to realize that then i guess you dont need this tip then do u? theres always exceptions to the rules; "i before e except after c?" that seems kinda weird doesn't it?

It has its limits Just like finding out the answer to any number multiplied by nine between one and nine. Where you take the number before the number you're trying to multiply with nine then find out what number added to it will equal nine then put the two numbers together and that is your answer. An example is 9 * 7 = 63 The 6 from 63 comes before the 7 from 9 * 7 and 3 added to the 6 will equal 9.

it kink of sucks because it would be a coincidence to run in to such a math question

yah you can teach this to children for trick purposes

try this:condition :two no. are of even dist.

ex:37*33 mid value =35

sq. 35 = 1225

37*33 = sq.35-dist b/w ywo digit i.e.4 = 1221

2 much of a coincidence needed 2 b of any use

very good

pretty cool!

its good to know some tricks

=)

pretty cool

Never thought i'd say this to a guy, but. I love ya man!

Very smart

THIS RULE IS JUST CRAP. IT DOESNT WORK

26 x26

46 x 47

98 x 97

12x19

Please remove this video else you may lend someone in trouble

Great job

hello, can i get any soft ware for this, like abacus solutions

hello can i get maths trick for download like this

not much useful

how to get by this 14

15,1418

cool~ tks a lot :D

very very cool!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

smart and when I did it it didn't work!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

very very intersesting and learning

Right is 13224

as per trick 24

26=624. So how to solve 3021 & 21*40## Share Your Thoughts